Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carolus de Tilly

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornVillerupt
19 Sep 166523.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 169250.0AppointedBishop of Acerra, Italy
27 Jan 169250.0Ordained BishopBishop of Acerra, Italy
3 Jun 169755.4AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
1698¹56.0DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carolus de Tilly:
Bishop Carolus de Tilly (born 1642, died 1698) Bishop of Monopoli

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 67, and Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015