Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Stefano Pastori

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1651BornGenova
22 Feb 169240.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Feb 169240.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 May 169543.6AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
23 May 169543.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
29 May 170048.6DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Stefano Pastori:
Bishop Giovanni Stefano Pastori (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 8.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 409
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015