Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Burchell Alexander McPherson

Bishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1951 BornMavis Bank-St. Andrew
1976²24.7Converted
1986²34.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
23 Jun 199140.1Ordained PriestPriest of Kingston in Jamaica, Antilles
11 Apr 201361.9AppointedBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles
8 Jun 201362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montego Bay, Jamaica, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Burchell Alexander McPherson:
Bishop Burchell Alexander McPherson (born ) Bishop of Montego Bay

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Montego Bay.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2013
  • ob: CB, 9 May 2013
  • c2+: CB, 4 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,801

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013