Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Antonio Fiorini, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pontremoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1861Born
14 Oct 187716.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Dec 188120.9Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Aug 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Sep 189938.6AppointedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
26 Nov 189938.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pontremoli, Italy
5 May 192968.3DiedBishop of Pontremoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Antonio Fiorini (VIAF: 307372455)
Bishop Angelo Antonio Fiorini O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Pontremoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampiglia Marittima, Diocese of Massa Marittima
Ordained BishopPiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017