Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Cappellari

Deceased

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1772BornRigolato
4 Apr 179522.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Feb 179623.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 183259.0SelectedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
2 Jul 183259.5ConfirmedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
18 Nov 183259.9Ordained BishopBishop of Vicenza, Italy
7 Feb 186087.1DiedBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Cappellari (VIAF: 254385138)
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Cappellari (born , died ) Bishop of Vicenza

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 395
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Aug 2016