Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Tang Yuange

Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1963 Born
1991²27.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 May 201450.4SelectedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
Oct 2015³51.8ConfirmedBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China
30 Nov 201653.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chengdu [Chengtu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Tang Yuange
Bishop Joseph Tang Yuange (born ) Bishop of Chengdu [Chengtu]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSichuan
Ordained BishopChengdu, Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chengdu [Chengtu].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast