Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Luo Xuegang

Bishop of Yibin [Suifu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1964² Born
30 Nov 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jan 201046.0SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
30 Nov 201147.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Yibin [Suifu], China
16 Dec 201248.9SucceededBishop of Yibin [Suifu], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Peter Luo Xuegang
Bishop Peter Luo Xuegang (born 1964) Bishop of Yibin [Suifu]

EventPlace
Ordained BishopYibin, Diocese of Yibin [Suifu]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yibin [Suifu].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast