Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul He Zinqing

Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1968 Born
1993²24.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Oct 200537.5Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China
8 Dec 200840.7AppointedBishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paul He Zinqing
Bishop Paul He Zinqing (born ) Bishop of Wanxian [Wanhsien]

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wanxian [Wanhsien].

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 9 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 28 Mar 2020

Quantcast