Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cyprian Stecki

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1734Born
4 Jun 1777³42.9AppointedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
10 Jul 177743.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
5 Jan 178752.5DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cyprian Stecki:
Bishop Cyprian Stecki (born , died ) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,898
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015