Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tadeusz Teodozy Rostocki, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1725²Born
1739²14.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
4 Dec 175328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
2 Jul 178459.5AppointedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
2 Aug 178459.5SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
11 Apr 178560.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
19 Jun 178560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
1 Nov 178863.8SucceededArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
4 Apr 179065.2ResignedBishop of Chełm (Ukrainian), Poland
25 Jan 180580.0DiedArchbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Teodozy Rostocki:
Archbishop Tadeusz Teodozy Rostocki O.S.B.M. (died ) Archbishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev}

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • b/ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,282
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 256, and Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015