Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Symeon Młotskyi (Młocki), O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Sep 1779AppointedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
20 Sep 1779Ordained BishopBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1795²ResignedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1804²DiedBishop Emeritus of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Symeon Młotskyi (Młocki):
Bishop Symeon Młotskyi (Młocki) O.S.B.M. (died 1804) Bishop Emeritus of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst

  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,901
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 299
  • d: CB, 19 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015