Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Młodowski, O.S.B.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1724¹BornVolyn
1738¹14.0ProfessedMember of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1747¹23.0Ordained PriestPriest of Basilian Order of Saint Josaphat (Order of St. Basil the Great)
1761²37.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
24 Jul 176137.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Pińsk-Turaŭ (Ukrainian), Belarus
10 Sep 176440.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
1 Feb 177854.0SucceededBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)
12 Jul 177854.5DiedBishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst (Ukrainian)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Młodowski:
Bishop Antoni Młodowski O.S.B.M. (born 1724, died ) Bishop of Volodymyr (Włodzimierz) et Brėst

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 279, and Page 298
  • ob: ATh, 13 Nov 2015
  • b: CB, 19 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 20 Nov 2015