Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis-Xavier Gsell, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Darwin

Titular Bishop of Paros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1872BornBanfeld, France
30 May 189623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
23 Apr 190633.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Victoria-Palmerston, Australia
29 Mar 193865.4AppointedBishop of Darwin, Australia
5 Jun 193865.6Ordained BishopBishop of Darwin, Australia
10 Nov 194876.0RetiredBishop of Darwin, Australia
10 Nov 194876.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
12 Jul 196087.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Darwin, Australia

MicroData Summary for Francis-Xavier Gsell:
Bishop Francis-Xavier Gsell M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Darwin

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013