Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominique Séguier

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Meaux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1593BornSaint-Denis
28 Sep 163138.1SelectedBishop of Auxerre, France
10 Nov 163138.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Corinthus
18 Jan 163238.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Corinthus
7 Jun 163238.8ConfirmedBishop of Auxerre, France
26 Aug 163744.0SelectedBishop of Meaux, France
10 Jan 163945.4ConfirmedBishop of Meaux, France
12 Mar 165965.6ResignedBishop of Meaux, France
16 May 165965.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Meaux, France

MicroData Summary for Dominique Séguier:
Bishop Dominique Séguier (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Meaux

  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 87, and Page 237
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 165
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015