Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean d’Estrade

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Condom


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹BornAgen
7 Dec 164739.9SelectedBishop of Condom, France
10 Feb 164840.1ConfirmedBishop of Condom, France
19 Apr 164840.2Ordained BishopBishop of Condom, France
1659¹51.0ResignedBishop of Condom, France
12 Jun 168577.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Condom, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean d’Estrade:
Bishop Jean d’Estrade (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Condom

  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 159
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015