Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Edilson Soares Nobre

Bishop-Elect of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1965 Born
6 Apr 199125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
11 Jan 201751.6AppointedBishop of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil
20 Mar 201751.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil
1 Apr 201751.8InstalledBishop of Oeiras, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Edilson Soares Nobre
Father Edilson Soares Nobre (born ) Bishop-Elect of Oeiras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTouros, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte
Ordained BishopCathedral, Natal, Archdiocese of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Oeiras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2017
  • ob: CB, 11 Jan 2017
  • c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Feb 2017