Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matias Patrício de Macêdo

Archbishop Emeritus of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1936 BornSantana do Matos
14 Jul 196327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
12 Jul 199054.2AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
21 Oct 199054.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
12 Jul 200064.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
29 Aug 200165.4SucceededBishop of Campina Grande, Paraiba, Brazil
26 Nov 200367.6AppointedArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
21 Dec 201175.7RetiredArchbishop of Natal, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Matias Patrício de Macêdo:
Archbishop Matias Patrício de Macêdo (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Natal

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Natal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,385
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013