Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Saldanha, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Bishop of Porto, Portugal

Note/Previous Titular See: (de Santa Maria)


Events

DateEventTitle
6 Mar 1690AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
25 Jul 1690Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
17 Dec 1696AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
26 Sep 1708DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José Saldanha
Bishop José Saldanha O.F.M. Disc. (died ) Bishop of Porto

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Antonio, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}

  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206, and Page 322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 23
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,076

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast