Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonijs Urbšs (Urbbs)

Deceased

Bishop of Liepāja, Latvia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1879Born
22 Mar 190323.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Apr 193858.4AppointedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
29 Jun 193858.5Ordained BishopBishop of Liepāja, Latvia
11 Aug 196585.7DiedBishop of Liepāja, Latvia

MicroData Summary for Antonijs Urbšs (Urbbs)
Bishop Antonijs Urbšs (Urbbs) (born , died ) Bishop of Liepāja

EventPlace
Birth PlacePandélys, Lithuania

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast