Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Sipendi

Deceased

Bishop of Moshi, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1915Born
20 Dec 194227.7Ordained PriestPriest
196650.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zanzibar e Pemba, Tanzania
196852.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Zanzibar e Pemba, Tanzania
11 Jan 196852.8AppointedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
24 Mar 196853.0Ordained BishopBishop of Moshi, Tanzania
29 Apr 198570.1DiedBishop of Moshi, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Joseph Sipendi
Bishop Joseph Sipendi (born , died ) Bishop of Moshi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilema

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast