Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicodemus Atle Basili Hhando

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mbulu, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1926Born
16 Feb 195831.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mbulu, Tanzania
3 Jul 197145.2AppointedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
3 Oct 197145.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
7 Mar 199770.9ResignedBishop of Mbulu, Tanzania
28 Dec 199771.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mbulu, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Nicodemus Atle Basili Hhando
Bishop Nicodemus Atle Basili Hhando (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbulu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBashanet

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast