Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Benoît de Clermont-Tonnerre

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642¹BornLingonen
22 Nov 167432.8SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
23 Mar 167634.2ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
26 Apr 167634.3Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
24 Aug 167836.6DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Benoît de Clermont-Tonnerre:
Bishop Antoine-Benoît de Clermont-Tonnerre (born 1642, died ) Bishop of Fréjus

  • a bishop for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015