Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Paolo Cardona Albini

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nemesi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1829Born
17 Dec 185324.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 188252.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nemesi
1 Oct 188252.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nemesi
1896¹66.1DiedTitular Bishop of Nemesi

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolo Cardona Albini
Bishop Francesco Paolo Cardona Albini (born , died 1896) Titular Bishop of Nemesi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy
Ordained BishopBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento, Italy

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 406
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,882, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast