Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Corbini

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

Titular Archbishop of Madytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1859BornSiena
3 Jun 188223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Siena, Italy
18 Jun 191859.1AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
4 Aug 191859.2Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
1 Oct 194687.4RetiredBishop of Foligno, Italy
1 Oct 194687.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus
15 Oct 195293.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Corbini:
Archbishop Stefano Corbini (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Foligno

  • a priest for 70.4 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013