Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Sayeghian

Deceased

Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1863BornAlep
21 Mar 190239.2AppointedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
8 Sep 190239.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria
1 Oct 192663.7DiedArchbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab] (Armenian), Syria

MicroData Summary for Augustin Sayeghian:
Archbishop Augustin Sayeghian (born , died ) Archbishop of Alep [Beroea, Halab]

  • a bishop for 24.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 87
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 44
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013