Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Boniface of Savoy

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Sep 1243AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 1245Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
18 Jul 1270DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Boniface of Savoy
Archbishop Boniface of Savoy (died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLyon, Archdiocese of Lyon, France

  • a bishop for 25.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 13
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,560

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast