Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Bronscombe

Deceased

Bishop of Exeter, England


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Feb 1258SelectedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 1258Ordained BishopBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain
22 Jul 1280DiedBishop of Exeter, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Bronscombe:
Bishop Walter Bronscombe (died ) Bishop of Exeter

  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 369

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013