Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William of Radnor

Deceased

Bishop of Llandaff, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1256AppointedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
7 Jan 1257Ordained BishopBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain
9 Jan 1266DiedBishop of Llandaff, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William of Radnor:
Bishop William of Radnor (died ) Bishop of Llandaff

  • a bishop for 9.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013