Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter d’Aigueblanche

Deceased

Bishop of Hereford, England


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1240AppointedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
23 Dec 1240Ordained BishopBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain
27 Nov 1268DiedBishop of Hereford, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Peter d’Aigueblanche:
Bishop Peter d’Aigueblanche (died ) Bishop of Hereford

  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 58
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 459

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013