Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas of Ely

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1266SelectedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1266Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 1268AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
12 Feb 1280DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas of Ely:
Bishop Nicolas of Ely (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 530, and Page 528
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 63
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 10, and Page 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013