Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giles of Bridport

Deceased

Bishop of Salisbury, England


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Apr 1256AppointedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
11 Mar 1257Ordained BishopBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain
13 Dec 1262DiedBishop of Salisbury, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Giles of Bridport:
Bishop Giles of Bridport (died ) Bishop of Salisbury

  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 596

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013