Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roger Longespee

Deceased

Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Jan 1257SelectedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
10 Mar 1258Ordained BishopBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain
16 Dec 1295DiedBishop of Coventry and Lichfield, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Roger Longespee:
Bishop Roger Longespee (died ) Bishop of Coventry and Lichfield

  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 207
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 61
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 549

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013