Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Anian Schonaw

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Asaph, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1268AppointedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
21 Oct 1268Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain
5 Feb 1293DiedBishop of Saint Asaph, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Anian Schonaw:
Bishop Anian Schonaw (died ) Bishop of Saint Asaph

  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 63
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013