Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Grosteste

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1175¹Born
1210¹35.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
1235²60.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
27 Mar 123560.2AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
17 Jun 123560.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
10 Oct 125378.7DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Grosteste
Bishop Robert Grosteste (born 1175, died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStradbroke, Suffolk
Ordained BishopReading

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 57
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 10
  • b: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 90, Number 7,548

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast