Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurence of Saint Martin

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Oct 1250SelectedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
9 Apr 1251Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
3 Jun 1274DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Laurence of Saint Martin:
Bishop Laurence of Saint Martin (died ) Bishop of Rochester

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 561

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013