Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Lambert de Hannotte

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Teos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1754³BornLiège, France
9 Mar 177722.9Ordained PriestPriest
26 Jun 180551.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Teos
4 Aug 180551.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Teos

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Lambert de Hannotte:
Bishop Jean Lambert de Hannotte (born ) Titular Bishop of Teos

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013