Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Pechuán Marín

Deceased

Bishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1913Born
16 Apr 193824.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
18 Aug 196349.7AppointedBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
21 Sep 196349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina
16 Dec 198370.0DiedBishop of Cruz del Eje, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Enrique Pechuán Marín
Bishop Enrique Pechuán Marín (born , died ) Bishop of Cruz del Eje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Juan de Cuyo

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast