Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan José Asenjo Pelegrina

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1945 BornSigüenza
21 Sep 196923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Sigüenza-Guadalajara, Spain
27 Feb 199751.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toledo, Spain
27 Feb 199751.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iziriana
20 Apr 199751.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iziriana
28 Jul 200357.8AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
13 Nov 200863.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
5 Nov 200964.1SucceededArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan José Asenjo Pelegrina:
Archbishop Juan José Asenjo Pelegrina (born ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Nov 2008
  • s: Bollettino, 5 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013