Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco San Andrés, O.S.H. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Salamanca

Titular Bishop of Zela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711²BornToledo
2 Oct 175847.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salamanca, Spain
2 Oct 175847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Zela
26 Nov 175847.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zela
20 Jan 176655.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Salamanca, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco San Andrés:
Bishop Francisco San Andrés O.S.H. (born 1711, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Salamanca

  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 77, Number 382
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 24
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 450, and Page 452

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015