Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Laso Santos de San Pedro

Deceased

Bishop of Santander


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1708³BornPozo de la Vega
29 Mar 176253.5AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
20 Jun 176253.7Ordained BishopBishop of Santander, Spain
14 Mar 178374.5DiedBishop of Santander, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Laso Santos de San Pedro:
Bishop Francisco Laso Santos de San Pedro (born , died ) Bishop of Santander

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Nov 2015