Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claudio Sanz Torres y Ruiz Castañedo

Deceased

Bishop of Almería, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1704³Born
13 Jul 176157.1AppointedBishop of Almería, Spain
6 Sep 176157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Almería, Spain
15 Jul 177975.2DiedBishop of Almería, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Claudio Sanz Torres y Ruiz Castañedo
Bishop Claudio Sanz Torres y Ruiz Castañedo (born May 1704, died ) Bishop of Almería

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorres de la Alameda

  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 78, Number 391
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1761, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast