Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Losada Quiroga

Deceased

Bishop of Mondoñedo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1703BornTrabazos
23 Nov 176158.7AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
2 May 176259.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
30 Jun 177976.3DiedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Losada Quiroga:
Bishop José Francisco Losada Quiroga (born , died ) Bishop of Mondoñedo

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 79, Number 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1762, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 289

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 16 Dec 2015