Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert John Rose

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1930 Born
21 Dec 195525.8Ordained PriestPriest of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
13 Oct 198151.6AppointedBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
6 Dec 198151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
24 Jun 198959.3AppointedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
30 Aug 198959.5InstalledBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA
13 Oct 200373.6ResignedBishop of Grand Rapids, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert John Rose
Bishop Robert John Rose (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Rapids

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrand Rapids

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Rapids.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast