Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Romualdo Velarde y Cienfuegos

Deceased

Bishop of Ávila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1701¹BornProaza
2 Oct 175857.7AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
26 Nov 175857.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
11 May 176665.3DiedBishop of Ávila, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Romualdo Velarde y Cienfuegos:
Bishop Romualdo Velarde y Cienfuegos (born 1701, died ) Bishop of Ávila

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 62
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 77, Number 381
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1758, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 21 Nov 2015