Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Pérez Minayo y Zumeda

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1695Born
21 Jul 175559.5AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
5 Oct 175559.7Ordained BishopBishop of Badajoz, Spain
28 Nov 177983.9DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Pérez Minayo y Zumeda
Bishop Manuel Pérez Minayo y Zumeda (born , died ) Bishop of Badajoz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrueña

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 73, Number 355
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast