Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Mascaron, C.O.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Agen, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1634Born
15 Jun 165824.2Ordained PriestPriest of Société de l’Oratoire de Jésus
Jan 167136.7SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
21 Mar 167238.0ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
8 May 167238.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
8 Jan 168045.8AppointedBishop of Agen, France
1 May 168046.1InstalledBishop of Agen, France
16 Nov 170369.6DiedBishop of Agen, France

MicroData Summary for Jules Mascaron
Bishop Jules Mascaron C.O.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Agen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 72, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1672, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast