Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Rocamora y García

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1832Born
21 May 189462.2AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
26 Aug 189462.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
19 Jan 192592.9DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rocamora y García (VIAF: 303932093)
Bishop Pedro Rocamora y García (born , died ) Bishop of Tortosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGranja de Rocamora, Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Orihuela, Diocese of Orihuela-Alicante

  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017