Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Bryan y Livermore

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1824BornMálaga
19 Dec 185733.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 188460.0AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
25 Jan 188560.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
11 Sep 190277.8DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Tomás Bryan y Livermore:
Bishop Tomás Bryan y Livermore (born , died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 186

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013