Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Joaquín Vilallonga y Bernia, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Ahmedabad, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1868Born
Aug 1885³16.9EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
28 Jul 190132.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 190536.4Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
1934²65.3AppointedSuperior of Ahmedabad, India
1949²80.3ResignedSuperior of Ahmedabad, India
1 Feb 196394.4DiedSuperior Emeritus of Ahmedabad, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Vilallonga y Bernia (VIAF: 29172739)
Father Joaquín Vilallonga y Bernia S.J. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Ahmedabad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurriana, Spain
Ordained PriestTortosa, Diocese of Tortosa, Spain
Death PlaceSingian Clinic, Manila, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines
Buried Place (Original)Jesuit novitiate, Cemetery, Novaliches, Archdiocese of Manila, Philippines

  • a priest for 61.5 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast