Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco de’ Notari, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jul 1644AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
17 Jul 1644Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
1652¹DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco de’ Notari
Bishop Francesco de’ Notari O.M. (died 1652) Bishop of Lavello

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 29
  • ob/c2+: AT, 9 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 11 Aug 2016